Accounts and annual returns WHEATLEY HILL SOCIAL WELFARE CENTRE
Charity number: 520907

Charity reporting is overdue by 1501 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 40 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 40 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 405 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 405 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 770 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 770 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Overdue by 1135 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Overdue by 1135 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | Overdue | Overdue by 1501 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Overdue | Overdue by 1501 days |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window