Financial history VILLAGE HALL (ASHPERTON)

Charity number: 520931
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1.38k £1.30k £1.03k £1.11k £10.58k
Total expenditure £1.14k £900 £725 £967 £2.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £10.00k