Trustees BARROW-IN-FURNESS UNIT NO 23 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS
Charity number: 521018
Charity reporting is overdue by 86 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Philip Henry Fulford | Chair | 13 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Anita Gwendoline Husband | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Colin Thomson | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Gary Gibbson | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jordan Aspin | Trustee | 19 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Gale | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Marie Gerrish | Trustee | 11 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
LT CDR PAUL GORDON DOUGLAS RN Retired | Trustee | 10 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Lieutenant SCC DAVID CONSTABLE RNR Rtd | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IAN GERRISH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
THE MARINE SOCIETY & SEA CADETS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.