Accounts and annual returns CLOCK FACE COLLIERY RECREATION GROUND AND CLUB

Charity number: 521031
Charity reporting is overdue by 1672 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 211 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 211 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 17 October 2023 351 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 17 October 2023 716 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 17 October 2023 1081 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1672 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1672 days