Financial history FLEETWOOD UNIT OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity number: 521102
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £24.44k £18.80k £24.66k £18.55k £24.76k
Total expenditure £20.42k £18.78k £24.86k £18.44k £12.45k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £17.67k