Financial history THE HORNBY VILLAGE TRUST

Charity number: 521122
Charity reporting is overdue by 142 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £50 £50 £82 £7.60k £123
Total expenditure £50 £50 £0 £13.09k £7.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A