Trustees HURST COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 521125
Charity reporting is overdue by 183 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARK FISH | Chair | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Sloan | Trustee | 14 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Aimee Carter-Roebuck | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Andrew Cochrane | Trustee | 03 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
NATALIE LYNE | Trustee | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
GEORGE RICHARD AMBLER | Trustee | 11 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
Mr Kishor Thaker | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.