Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST ANDREW WITH HOLY CROSS
Charity number: 1201526
Recently registered
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Timothy John Gordon Brampton | Chair | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Vera Tomlinson | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Leonard Stubberfield | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anne Elizabeth Liddell | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Trudy Ann Arnold | Trustee | 12 December 2021 |
|
|||||
Emma Louise Lamb | Trustee | 09 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anna Eveline Graham | Trustee | 09 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Philip Michael Horscroft | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
FRANCES SARAH GRAHAM | Trustee | 24 March 2019 |
|
|||||
David Theodore Marshall | Trustee | 24 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Marion Marshall | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev Karen Anne White | Trustee | 01 December 2003 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.