BOLD COLLIERY RECREATION GROUND AND WELFARE INSTITUTE

Charity number: 521281
Charity reporting is overdue by 331 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 331 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 331 days
Annual return 31 December 2018 23 April 2020 175 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 26 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 26 July 2018 268 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 11 May 2017 192 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 11 May 2017 192 days late Download