Trustees THE BARLOW INSTITUTE
Charity number: 521333
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN MARRIOTT | Trustee | 23 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rhian Driver | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Philip Norman Grundy | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Barnaby Guy Haynes | Trustee | 13 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Kerry Holt | Trustee | 13 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Michael William Fay | Trustee | 18 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Philip McDermott | Trustee | 03 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paul Allen | Trustee | 30 May 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.