Financial history COLEORTON SOCIAL WELFARE CENTRE

Charity number: 521403
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £4.74k £12.51k £3.77k £2.48k £3.30k
Total expenditure £5.65k £6.45k £10.17k £3.43k £5.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A