16TH LANCASTER (ST PAUL'S) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 521575
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £20.75k £18.48k £21.73k £24.17k £20.69k
Total expenditure £22.77k £26.39k £18.60k £19.56k £17.65k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A