Trustees ST LUKES WIDNES SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 521703
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Daniel Liam Roberts | Trustee | 09 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
ADELE MOTTERSHEAD | Trustee | 28 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Christopher Duckett | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Clare Liptrott | Trustee | 07 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Janet Saville | Trustee | 22 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
JAYNE CURLETT | Trustee | 06 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Jane Myers | Trustee | 01 September 2004 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.