1ST HUGGLESCOTE ROBIN HOOD SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 521726
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £4.07k £6.11k £11.45k £7.50k £6.18k
Total expenditure £4.91k £3.30k £5.40k £7.73k £7.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A