Financial history STUBTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 521870
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/03/2022
Total gross income £7.38k £2.42k £14.63k £17.71k £11.92k
Total expenditure £2.06k £1.88k £25.71k £3.44k £6.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £690 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £10.00k N/A