Financial history DINNINGTON VILLAGE SOCIAL WELFARE CENTRE

Charity number: 522055
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £25.31k £23.59k £16.45k £31.05k £44.41k
Total expenditure £23.26k £19.82k £16.59k £11.29k £16.00k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £20.00k £25.92k