Trustees COURT MEADOW GROUP RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION INCORPORATING CARRIAGE DRIVING
Charity number: 1203735
Recently registered
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michelle Dolly Hunton | Chair | 22 July 2010 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Black | Trustee | 21 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Strong | Trustee | 21 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Sarah Walker | Trustee | 21 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Entwisle | Trustee | 04 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Parnell | Trustee | 06 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Karkia | Trustee | 04 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Malins | Trustee | 02 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN WELCH | Trustee | 21 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Susan Hawkins | Trustee | 04 July 2006 |
|
|
||||
Susan Coote | Trustee | 06 July 2000 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.