TYNE YOUTH & COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 522148
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £12.78k £19.85k £15.26k £14.90k £22.69k
Total expenditure £13.36k £14.76k £19.40k £15.06k £15.77k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £22.69k