BENTINCK MINERS' WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 522233
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £33.80k £48.64k £41.21k £50.12k £39.08k
Total expenditure £32.45k £36.62k £36.85k £42.74k £61.86k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A