Financial history THE BOYS' BRIGADE, NOTTINGHAM BATTALION

Charity number: 522262
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £9.82k £9.26k £17.23k £10.77k £3.54k
Total expenditure £13.39k £12.85k £14.20k £12.24k £4.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A