2ND ARNOLD (ST MARY'S) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 522423
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £18.30k £17.84k £12.89k £21.15k £19.19k
Total expenditure £16.80k £18.47k £9.41k £31.54k £12.87k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A