Trustees RUSHCLIFFE DISTRICT SCOUT ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 522469
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Timothy David Kirby | Chair | 19 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Karl Lewis | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
MATTHEW STEPHEN GARRARD | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
William Cullen | Trustee | 14 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Father Simon Gillespie | Trustee | 14 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Ena Scott | Trustee | 16 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Helen Holland | Trustee | 23 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Burrows | Trustee | 17 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alexander John Newson | Trustee | 20 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
CHRIS KEAST | Trustee | 17 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
PETER GILKS | Trustee | 01 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
Clare Elizabeth Deeming | Trustee |
|
||||||
PATRICIA JOAN SHEPHERD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NIGEL PETER MORGAN NURSE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID JAMES PENROSE SNOWDEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALAN SURRAGE HUBBER | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.