Financial history BURTON ON TRENT UNIT 61 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity number: 522626
Charity reporting is overdue by 973 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £27.36k £20.05k £24.82k £34.04k £77.40k
Total expenditure £30.77k £18.76k £21.74k £30.73k £35.52k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A