Governing document WILLOUGHBRIDGE GARDEN TRUST
Charity number: 522695
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE AND TRUST DEED DATED 12TH APRIL 1958 AND SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 11TH NOVEMBER 1958 AS VARIED BY SCHEMES DATED 8TH JUNE 1965 AND 11 AUGUST 1993. EFFECTED BY SCHEME OF 17TH MARCH 1998.
Charitable objects
(1) A MEMORIAL GARDEN FOR THE REST AND RECREATION OF THE PUBLIC (2) THE PROMOTION OF HORTICULTURAL EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF STUDENTS AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.