Trustees WARWICKSHIRE COUNTY FEDERATION OF YOUNG FARMERS CLUBS
Charity number: 523045
Charity reporting is up to date (88 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
21 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Will Rowland | Chair | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lucas Mann | Trustee | 05 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Chapman | Trustee | 05 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Charlotte Rowland | Trustee | 05 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Wilson | Trustee | 05 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Isme Mason | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jordan Pointon | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katy Walsh | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joshua Hall-Webley | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martin Brandreth | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dave Odell | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Adam Lynch | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Georgia Payne | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Jeyes | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hadyn Lowe | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Charlie Beaty | Trustee | 10 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ailish Ross | Trustee | 28 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Matt Ingram | Trustee | 28 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Megan Bailey | Trustee | 03 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ellie Carvell | Trustee | 03 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Robert Mitchell | Trustee | 11 November 2016 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.