Trustees OFFENHAM VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 523168
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Moclair | Chair | 25 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kay Molloy | Trustee | 08 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Jane Propert | Trustee | 08 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Henderson | Trustee | 04 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Gladys Briers | Trustee | 03 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
KELLY PARKINSON | Trustee | 28 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN GLYN ROBERTS | Trustee | 25 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
Susan Uri | Trustee | 09 February 2009 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.