Financial history BIRCHLEY PARK

Charity number: 523169
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £22.62k £18.49k £18.68k £0 £0
Total expenditure £22.62k £18.49k £18.68k £0 £0
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A