Financial history BURYHILL PARK

Charity number: 523172
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £3.26k £0 £6.66k £7.97k £8.20k
Total expenditure £3.26k £7.81k £6.66k £7.97k £8.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A