Trustees HAXEY TENNIS CLUB
Charity number: 1207826
Recently registered
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Carter | Chair | 01 March 2010 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Carolyn Storrs | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alison Fiona Turner | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
JOHN WINDLE | Trustee | 27 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Korena louise Gavin | Trustee | 20 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Anne Duncanson | Trustee | 20 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Christine Connor | Trustee | 01 February 2010 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Peter Jesson | Trustee | 10 March 2006 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.