Trustees LONG RISTON PLAYING FIELDS COMMITTEE
Charity number: 523268
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JULIE RICHARDSON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Steven Turner | Trustee | 16 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Louise Meese | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Major | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Jayne Stonier | Trustee | 31 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Darling | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Kay | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mike Bloede | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Sherwood | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stewart Emerson | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.