LLANELLY HILL SOCIAL WELFARE CENTRE

Charity number: 523661
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £8.06k £8.50k £4.25k £20.59k £12.70k
Total expenditure £8.06k £8.50k £2.71k £20.59k £12.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A