Trustees CWMGWILI MINERS' WELFARE ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 523889
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEPHEN JEACOCK | Chair | 16 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
Judith Taylor | Trustee | 10 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Lesley Tutton | Trustee | 10 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kirsty Gooch | Trustee | 03 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Lynn Samuel | Trustee | 29 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Carolynne Samuel | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Susan Wallis | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Terence Thomas | Trustee | 16 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Helen Thompson | Trustee | 16 October 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.