THURNSCOE (COMMON ROAD) MINERS' WELFARE SCHEME

Charity number: 523972
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £7.96k £3.50k £2.50k £1.37k £4.88k
Total expenditure £7.96k £3.50k £2.50k £1.37k £4.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A