Trustees CEIRIOG MEMORIAL INSTITUTE (NEUADD GOFFA CEIRIOG)
Charity number: 524063
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BRYN HUGHES | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Meinir Ffion Austin | Trustee | 03 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Maria Haines | Trustee | 10 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
ROWENA LEWIS | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
John Peter Bates | Trustee | 01 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
MERYL FALMAI PARRY | Trustee | 10 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
LLINOS MAI KILFOIL | Trustee | 10 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
LINDA JOY HUGHES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BETTY DAVIES | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.