BARRY UNIT 24 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity number: 524111
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £10.85k £8.63k £3.19k £7.75k £13.89k
Total expenditure £9.34k £5.08k £5.67k £6.07k £12.04k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A