MERLINS BRIDGE WELFARE CENTRE

Charity number: 524433
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £14.56k £22.06k £21.44k £15.85k £11.31k
Total expenditure £16.20k £10.00k £14.62k £18.16k £19.86k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £625