Trustees THE GUIDE ASSOCIATION BIRMINGHAM
Charity number: 524565
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helen Clare Groom | Trustee | 25 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Clair Helen Conaghan | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alison Elizabeth Adkins | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anne Mc Gibbon | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Clarke | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Georgina Louisa Hunt | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Melisa Jane Watkins | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Louise Wilkes | Trustee | 08 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sara Ann Miles | Trustee | 22 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Mary Louise Jones | Trustee | 25 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Susan Ann Stewart | Trustee | 12 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Claire Parker | Trustee | 12 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Joy Waldron | Trustee | 08 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Linda Diane Bateman | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|||||
Elaine Kedwards | Trustee | 30 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
JANICE ELIZABETH PRICE | Trustee | 01 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
HAZEL CLAIRE MEGAHEY | Trustee | 11 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Kathryn ALEXANDER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.