1ST WALL HEATH SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 524622
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £18.33k £19.46k £23.46k £19.36k £23.19k
Total expenditure £16.69k £8.94k £10.10k £16.17k £15.61k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A