2ND NORMANBY (ST GEORGE'S) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 524698
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £3.41k £2.86k £8.94k £2.16k £3.14k
Total expenditure £3.04k £2.05k £2.92k £487 £2.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A