Trustees 14TH ROTHERHAM BRAMLEY CHURCH SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 524720
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kathy Wood | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Harvey | Trustee | 08 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jacquline Tattershall | Trustee | 10 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
GILL LAVENDER | Trustee | 27 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
MRS PAM MASSINGHAM | Trustee | 14 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
VALERIE SHIRLEY DYSON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.