Financial history DONCASTER DANUM SCOUTS

Charity number: 524729
Charity reporting is overdue by 2 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022
Total gross income £103.77k £143.67k £92.88k £60.04k £61.06k
Total expenditure £99.68k £154.85k £95.16k £69.70k £58.11k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A