Trustees SPEN VALLEY DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 524812
Charity reporting is up to date (33 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr David Kelly Chair 01 July 2021
None on record
Lesley Austin Trustee 21 June 2023
None on record
Rebecca Holroyd Trustee 29 June 2022
None on record
Michael Holroyd Trustee 01 July 2021
None on record
Elizabeth Midgley Trustee 01 July 2021
None on record
Joshua Newlands Trustee 01 July 2021
None on record
Sarah Sowden Trustee 01 June 2019
None on record
Chris Rhodes Trustee 01 June 2019
None on record
David Sowden Trustee 01 June 2017
None on record
David Hirst Trustee 01 June 2017
None on record
RICHARD TERRY Trustee 15 January 2013
None on record
NEIL SMITH Trustee 15 January 2013
14TH SPEN VALLEY (WHITECHAPEL) SCOUT GROUP
Overdue by 78 days
MIKE TERRY Trustee 08 January 2013
None on record