Trustees WEST YORKSHIRE COUNTY SCOUT COUNCIL
Charity number: 524829
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carey Dowson | Chair | 02 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Rhodes | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Susan Galvin | Trustee | 06 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Caselton | Trustee | 23 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Pierce | Trustee | 17 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ian Martin Womersley | Trustee | 23 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tobias Hammond | Trustee | 12 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
BETHANIE JENNIFER LORRAINE HALLIGAN | Trustee | 14 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
John Reynolds | Trustee | 15 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Howard Fishwick | Trustee | 15 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN MARGARET CAINE | Trustee | 11 September 2014 |
|
|||||
ELAINE CLOUGH | Trustee | 10 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
Jeanette Young | Trustee | 12 October 2011 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.