Financial history WYLAM COMMUNITY PLAYING FIELDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 525203
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £61.92k £26.24k £7.13k £14.20k £8.88k
Total expenditure £64.35k £12.57k £15.78k £11.48k £17.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £40.00k N/A N/A £12.64k N/A