DAME DOROTHY JEFFREYS' CHARITY

Charity number: 525398
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £2 £2.05k £8.01k £15.66k £9.78k
Total expenditure £10.41k £7.13k £8.93k £14.71k £6.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A