Financial history COWBRIDGE COMPREHENSIVE SCHOOL TRUST

Charity number: 525559
Charity reporting is overdue by 78 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £52.40k £56.07k £59.43k £55.53k £40.27k
Total expenditure £86.57k £98.39k £127.45k £40.43k £59.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £30.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A