THE REES LLEWELLYN SCHOLARSHIP FUND

Charity number: 525582
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/10/2016 30/10/2017 30/10/2018 30/10/2019 30/10/2020
Total gross income £7.06k £7.51k £7.84k £8.35k £8.25k
Total expenditure £6.90k £6.04k £4.45k £7.66k £8.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A