Trustees POWNALL HALL SCHOOL TRUST LIMITED
Charity number: 525929
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EILEEN MACAULAY | Chair | 24 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
Karen Mehta | Trustee | 20 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Simmonds | Trustee | 04 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Debra Hueting | Trustee | 21 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Kelly | Trustee | 07 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rollo Barnaby Wilson Wood | Trustee | 12 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Niamh Maria Wood | Trustee | 12 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
THOMAS JAMES WAREHAM | Trustee | 21 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
TERENCE FREDERICK BARNES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GRAHAM DEREK DAWBER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.