CAWTHORNE EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 526331
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £5.80k £5.90k £13.54k £35.37k £13.46k
Total expenditure £3.37k £44.43k £27.83k £27.48k £14.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A