THE BERSAM TRUST

Charity number: 526452
Regulatory alert
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £358.47k £303.31k £378.45k £396.24k £372.07k
Total expenditure £66.35k £170.15k £113.49k £136.46k £152.99k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A